Alex Howard v. First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA et al
Plaintiff: Alex Howard d/b/a ServiceMaster by Howard and Alex Howard doing business as ServiceMaster by Howard
Defendant: First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder, LA, Church Mutual Insurance Company, First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA and Church Mutual Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Counter Defendant: Alex Howard
Case Number: 2:2021cv03181
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Eric D Burt for Church Mutual Insurance Co,Eric D Burt for Church Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/28/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Eric D. Burt to Enroll as Counsel by Church Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2021. (aty,Amedee, Jordan) Modified on 10/27/2021 to indicate proposed order included within pdf of main document. (Crick, S).
October 27, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #14 MOTION for Eric D. Burt to Enroll as Counsel . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Church Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Amedee, Jordan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Alex Howard. (aty,Jones, Christopher)
October 14, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action to First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA regarding #10 Corrective Document. Action taken: Modified to reflect filing as (Duplicate of #9 Answer but containing s/signature of counsel.). (crt,Reeves, T)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, Counterclaim, sent to Wells Talbot Watson on behalf of First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/28/2021. (crt,Whidden, C)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT (Duplicate of #9 Answer containing s/signature of counsel.) entitled Answer, Counterclaim, Crossclaim filed by First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA regarding #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, . (aty,Watson, Wells) Modified to reflect filing is a duplicate of doc 9 which did not have s/signature of counsel on 10/18/2021 (Reeves, T).
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Church Mutual Insurance Co, COUNTERCLAIM against Alex Howard by First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA.(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA(pty:dft))(aty,Watson, Wells)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim: Responses due by 10/22/2021, Replies due by 10/27/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 10/8/2021. (crt,Higgins, M)
September 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/29/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Church Mutual Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent, Church Mutual Holding Co Inc for Church Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Amedee, Jordan) Modified on 9/29/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Church Mutual Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Jordan Paul Amedee added to party Church Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Amedee, Jordan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Howard. Church Mutual Insurance Co served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (aty,Jones, Christopher)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Howard. First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (aty,Jones, Christopher)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Church Mutual Insurance Co, First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA. (crt,Crick, S)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S)
August 31, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Church Mutual Insurance Co, First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4803752) filed by Alex Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party Alex Howard (pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified on 9/1/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alex Howard v. First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Howard d/b/a ServiceMaster by Howard
Represented By: Christopher K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Howard doing business as ServiceMaster by Howard
Represented By: Christopher K Jones
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder, LA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First United Pentecostal Church of DeRidder LA
Represented By: Wells Talbot Watson
Represented By: Jake Danten Buford
Represented By: Jeffrey T Gaughan
Represented By: Jennifer Perez
Represented By: Meagan Nicole Johnson
Represented By: Melissa A Shaw-Brown
Represented By: Zita Marie Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Eric D Burt
Represented By: John M Futrell
Represented By: Jordan Paul Amedee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alex Howard
Represented By: Christopher K Jones
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?