Jackson et al v. Apache Corp (of Delaware) et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Jackson, Sr and Rachel E Jackson
Defendant: Apache Corp (of Delaware), BP America Production Company, H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc, International Well Testers, Inc., Wagner Oil Co, Apache Corp, B P America Production Co and International Well Testers Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv03263
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Apache Corp, B P America Production Co, Wagner Oil Co. (Attachments: #1 Exh A, #2 Exh A-1, #3 Exh A-2, #4 Exh A-3, #5 Exh A-4, #6 Exh A-5, #7 Exh A-6, #8 Exh A-7, #9 Exh A-8, #10 Exh A-9, #11 Exh A-10, #12 Exh A-11, #13 Exh A-12, #14 Exh A-13, #15 Exh A-14, #16 Exh A-15, #17 Exh A-16, #18 Exh A-17, #19 Exh A-18, #20 Exh A-19, #21 Exh A-20, #22 Exh A-21, #23 Exh A-22, #24 Exh A-23, #25 Exh A-24, #26 Exh A-25, #27 Exh A-26, #28 Exh A-27, #29 Exh A-28, #30 Exh A-29, #31 Exh A-30, #32 Exh A-31, #33 Exh A-32, #34 Exh A-33, #35 Exh A-34, #36 Exh A-35)(aty,Troutman, John)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Chad E Mudd, David P Bruchhaus, and Matthew Patrick Keating for Jerome Jackson, Sr., and Rachel E Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/15/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc (Attorney Jonathan R Cook added to party H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc(pty:dft)). (aty,Cook, Jonathan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Chad E. Mudd, David P. Bruchhaus, and Matthew Keating to Enroll as Counsel by Jerome Jackson, Sr, Rachel E Jackson. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aty,Owen, D)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #16 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Jerome Jackson, Sr, Rachel E Jackson. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit)(aty,Owen, D)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand. Compliance Deadline set for 10/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/22/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand with consent Plaintiffs' Motion and Incorporated Memorandum for Allotment of Their Statutorily Authorized Time Delay to File Their Motion to Remand by Jerome Jackson, Sr, Rachel E Jackson. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of No Opposition)(aty,Owen, D) Modified on 9/20/2021 (Thomas, T).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension to Extend Filing Deadlines & Stay Rule 26 Requirements Pending Ruling on Remand Motion. No defendant shall be required to file responsive pleadings pending further instructions of the Court after Plaintiffs Motion to Remand has been fully briefed and litigated to conclusion;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conferenceand all obligations of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 shall be stayed pending further instructions of the Court after Plaintiffs Motion to Remand has been fully litigated and decided by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/17/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Apache Corp, B P America Production Co, Wagner Oil Co . (aty,Arceneaux, George)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Stay Rule 26 Requirements Pending Ruling on Remand Motion filed by B P America Production Co, Jerome Jackson, Sr, Wagner Oil Co, Apache Corp, Rachel E Jackson. The motion is being granted by separate, written order; however, plaintiff is to file the Motion to Remand contemplated by that motion on or before 10/1/2021. Failure to file the Motion to Remand timely will result in the order being rescinded and deadlines reset. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/17/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/15/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Stay Rule 26 Requirements Pending Ruling on Remand Motion with consent by Apache Corp, B P America Production Co, H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc, Wagner Oil Co and plaintiffs, Jerome Jackson Sr and Rachel E Jackson. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Arceneaux, George) Modified filers and text on 9/15/2021 (Reeves, T).
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wagner Oil Co. (aty,Bailey, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apache Corp identifying Corporate Parent A P A Corp for Apache Corp. (aty,Longman, Douglas) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (Reeves, T).
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Carmen M Rodriguez on behalf of Apache Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christopher B Bailey on behalf of Wagner Oil Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/13/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Apache Corp, BP America Production Company, Wagner Oil Co. (aty,Arceneaux, George)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP plc for BP America Production Company. (aty,Arceneaux, George)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 31st JDC Jefferson Davis Parish, Case Number C-025621 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4814560) filed by BP America Production Company, Apache Corp, Wagner Oil Company, H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Certificate of Notice, #9 Notice of Filing-Certificate of Removing Defendants, #10 Roster of Attorneys, #11 Notice to Adverse Parties of Filing)(Attorney George Arceneaux, III added to party Apache Corp(pty:dft), Attorney George Arceneaux, III added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney George Arceneaux, III added to party H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc(pty:dft), Attorney George Arceneaux, III added to party Wagner Oil Company(pty:dft))(aty,Arceneaux, George)
September 10, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 10, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 31st JDC, Parish of Jefferson Davis. Apache Corp (of Delaware) answer due 9/17/2021; BP America Production Company answer due 9/17/2021; H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc answer due 9/17/2021; International Well Testers, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Wagner Oil Co answer due 9/17/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF images can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Apache Corp (of Delaware) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Jackson, Sr
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Michael Louis Heaton
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel E Jackson
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Caroline Hidalgo Martin
Represented By: Christopher D Martin
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Leah Cotten Poole
Represented By: Michael Louis Heaton
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp (of Delaware)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: John Seth Troutman
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Court C VanTassell
Represented By: Emily Claire Borgen
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Randee Victoria Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H L Hawkins & H L Hawkins Jr Inc
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Represented By: Jonathan R Cook
Represented By: Sara M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Well Testers, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Robert Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Oil Co
Represented By: Christopher B Bailey
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Randazzo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: Boyd A Bryan
Represented By: Douglas C Longman, Jr
Represented By: Frederick Gibbons Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B P America Production Co
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: John Seth Troutman
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Court C VanTassell
Represented By: Emily Claire Borgen
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Randee Victoria Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Well Testers Inc
Represented By: Thomas Robert Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?