Project Build A Future L L C v. Great Lakes Insurance S E
Plaintiff: Project Build A Future L L C
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance S E
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv03607
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand with Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION to Expedite filed by Project Build A Future L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Charla Blake)(aty,Filo, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Great Lakes Insurance S E . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Record)(aty,Vorhaben, Tessa)
November 11, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand with Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION to Expedite filed by Great Lakes Insurance S E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration)(aty,Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #8 MOTION to Remand with Request for Expedited Consideration MOTION to Expedite. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 12/29/2021 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand with Request for Expedited Consideration by Project Build A Future L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of proposed order)(aty,Filo, Thomas). Added MOTION to Expedite on 10/28/2021 (Bunting, M). Modified to add additional relief requested on 10/28/2021 (Bunting, M).
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Lakes Insurance S E identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Co for Great Lakes Insurance S E. (aty,Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Great Lakes Insurance S E.(aty,Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/18/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Tessa Pousson Vorhaben on behalf of Great Lakes Insurance S E. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/28/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/14/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T)
October 14, 2021 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:21-cv-3607 from Alexandria Division to Lake Charles Division. New Case Number 2:21-cv-3607. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 13, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 13, 2021 CITY COURT Service Returned Executed. Great Lakes Insurance S E answer due 10/20/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Lake Charles City Court, Case Number 21-1530-B (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4854070) filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Tessa Pousson Vorhaben added to party Great Lakes Insurance SE(pty:dft))(aty,Vorhaben, Tessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project Build A Future L L C v. Great Lakes Insurance S E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Build A Future L L C
Represented By: Thomas A Filo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance S E
Represented By: Tessa Pousson Vorhaben
Represented By: Matthew A Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?