Boone v. G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc
Plaintiff: Gregory W. Boone and Gregory W Boone
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. and G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv03709
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul for G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/10/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Julie Hunter-Anderson for G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/10/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4889648) by G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Gauthier, Camille)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Julie Hunter-Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4889607) by G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Gauthier, Camille)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc . (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(aty,Gauthier, Camille)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc.(aty,Gauthier, Camille)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/25/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent G 4 S Holding One Inc, G 4 S U S A Holdings Ltd, G 4 S Corporate Services Ltd, G 4 S p l c for G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc. (aty,Gauthier, Camille) Modified docket text on 10/21/2021 (Miletello, A).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Camille E Gauthier on behalf of G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/4/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 19, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-3946 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4863289) filed by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition Exhibit A)(Attorney Camille E Gauthier added to party G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Gauthier, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory W. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory W Boone
Represented By: Desherick J W Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Camille E Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G 4 S Secure Solutions U S A Inc
Represented By: Camille E Gauthier
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth Hunter-Anderson
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?