Thomas et al v. U S A A General Indemnity Co et al
Plaintiff: Dana Thomas and Oliver Walker
Defendant: U S A A General Indemnity Co and John Alcorn
Case Number: 2:2021cv04143
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 04:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Alcorn, U S A A General Indemnity Co.(aty,Rhoades, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/7/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Alcorn, U S A A General Indemnity Co identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for U S A A General Indemnity Co. (aty,Rhoades, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jeffrey Allan Rhoades on behalf of U S A A General Indemnity Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/17/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/3/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-4245 B with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4914976) filed by John Alcorn, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- State Court Petition and IRPD to Defendants, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 State court notice of filing)(Attorney Jeffrey Allan Rhoades added to party John Alcorn(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Allan Rhoades added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(aty,Rhoades, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 3, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. U S A A General Indemnity Co answer due 12/10/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #2 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. U S A A General Indemnity Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Thomas
Represented By: Christopher C McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Walker
Represented By: Christopher C McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S A A General Indemnity Co
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Alcorn
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?