Hanks et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Ted Hanks and Carolyn Hanks
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co and Liberty Personal Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04275
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Liberty Personal Insurance Co.(aty,deGoede, Arianna)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Liberty Personal Insurance Co answer due 1/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/14/2022. (crt,Benoit, T)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Katherine Lynne Swartout for Liberty Personal Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/14/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Katherine L. Swartout to Enroll as Counsel by Liberty Personal Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,deGoede, Arianna)
January 12, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Katherine L. Swartout to Enroll as Counsel . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ted Hanks, Carolyn Hanks. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (aty,Brown, Somer)
December 29, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Personal Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Co Inc, Corporate Parent L M H C Massachusetts Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Co for Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,deGoede, Arianna) Modified to more accurately identify filer on 1/3/2022. (Alexander, E)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Arianna Elizabeth deGoede added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,deGoede, Arianna)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4927117) filed by Ted Hanks, Carolyn Hanks. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Somer George Brown added to party Carolyn Hanks(pty:pla), Attorney Somer George Brown added to party Ted Hanks(pty:pla))(aty,Brown, Somer)
December 14, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanks et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Hanks
Represented By: Michael K Cox
Represented By: Somer George Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Hanks
Represented By: Somer George Brown
Represented By: Michael K Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Arianna Elizabeth deGoede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Personal Insurance Co
Represented By: H Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Katherine Lynne Swartout
Represented By: Arianna Elizabeth deGoede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?