Wentzell et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Plaintiff: Charles H Wentzell and Margaret Wentzell
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04292
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Strauss, David)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 1/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/10/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Strauss, David)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(Attorney David A Strauss added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Strauss, David)
January 6, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles H Wentzell. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (aty,Kothari, Nishi)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4928048) filed by Charles H. Wentzell, Margaret Wentzell. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Nishi Vimal Kothari added to party Charles H. Wentzell(pty:pla), Attorney Nishi Vimal Kothari added to party Margaret Wentzell(pty:pla))(aty,Kothari, Nishi)
December 14, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wentzell et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Wentzell
Represented By: Nishi Vimal Kothari
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Wentzell
Represented By: Nishi Vimal Kothari
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: David A Strauss
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Lauricella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?