Robin v. Ekleberry et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Robin
Defendant: Brandon Ekleberry, Central Pony Express Inc, Sentry Select Insurance Co and Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2021cv04294
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER Governing Pretrial Procedure: Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2023 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 6/27/2023 10:30 AM in by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 5/22/2023. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 6/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2023. Daubert Motions due by 7/20/2023. Motions in Limine due by 7/20/2023. Compel discovery 7/20/2023. Deadline for filing motion for protective order is 8/21/2023. Pretrial statements due by 8/21/2023. Jury Charges/Verdict Form due by 9/5/2023. Electronic Exhibits due by 9/11/2023. Real Time glossary due by 9/11/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/2/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
June 2, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/2/2022. Participating by telephone: Tucker Wagner Nims for plaintiff and Steven Bernard Rabalais for defendants. A Jury Trial is set for 9/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/29/2023 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Magistrate Judge Status Conference is set for 6/27/2023 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Counsel are to call into the Chambers Teleconference Line at 877-336-1274, Access Code 7066014, to participate in the MJSC. See separately docketed Scheduling Order and document linked thereto for additional deadlines and explanations of those deadlines. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 20 Proposed Plan for Discovery RULE 26(f) Report by Alexander Robin, Sentry Select Insurance Co, Central Pony Express Inc, Brandon Ekleberry. (aty,Nims, Tucker) Modified on 5/17/2022 to add filers (Jones, P).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 11:00 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T)
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages served on Sentry Select Insurance Company on 11/23/2021, filed by Alexander Robin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Nims, Tucker) Modified on 2/24/2022 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 22, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages served on Central Pony Express Inc. on 11/22/2021, filed by Alexander Robin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Nims, Tucker) Modified on 2/24/2022 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages served on Brandon Ekleberry on 11/22/2021, filed by Alexander Robin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Nims, Tucker) Modified on 2/24/2022 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 4, 2022 Filing 15 JUDGMENT granting #12 Joint Stipulation and Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 2/4/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co re #12 Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary. (aty,Corry, Michael)
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency to Michael P Corry on behalf of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, Alexander Robin regarding #12 Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. Event to use is Proposed Order/Judgment. (crt,Jones, P)
January 31, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/3/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
January 31, 2022 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, Alexander Robin. (aty,Corry, Michael) Modified on 2/2/2022 to capture more accurate event and indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 2/3/2022 to remove deficiency See #14 (Jones, P).
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR. RULE 26 Intial Disclosures by Central Pony Express Inc, Brandon Ekleberry, Sentry Select Insurance Co . (aty,Eiden, Melvin) Modified on 1/27/2022 to more accurately describe pleading submitted and reflect filed in error. (Miletello, A).
January 27, 2022 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Melvin A Eiden on behalf of Central Pony Express Inc, Brandon Ekleberry, Sentry Select Insurance Co regarding #11 Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. Action taken: Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 26.5, FRCP5(d) and Standing Order 1.15; local and federal rules do not allow routine filing of discovery, including disclosures and subpoenas under Rule 26. No further action on part of counsel is required. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Central Pony Express Inc, Brandon Ekleberry, Sentry Select Insurance Co.(aty,Rabalais, Steven)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. (aty,Corry, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.(aty,Corry, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co (Attorney Michael P Corry added to party Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co(pty:dft)). (aty,Corry, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sentry Select Insurance Co. (aty,Rabalais, Steven)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Pony Express Inc. (aty,Eiden, Melvin)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/15/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Steven Bernard Rabalais, Blake Taylor Couvillion, Melvin A Eiden on behalf of Central Pony Express Inc, Sentry Select Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 14, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co answer due 12/21/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND AT ATTACHMENT #3 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P)
December 14, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14TH JDC, Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-4343 DIV. G with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4928151) filed by Sentry Select Insurance Co, Central Pony Express Inc, Brandon Ekleberry. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney Melvin A Eiden added to party Central Pony Express Inc, Ekleberry, Sentry Select Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Eiden, Melvin) Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin v. Ekleberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Robin
Represented By: Tucker Wagner Nims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Ekleberry
Represented By: Melvin A Eiden
Represented By: Steven Bernard Rabalais
Represented By: Blake Taylor Couvillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Pony Express Inc
Represented By: Melvin A Eiden
Represented By: Steven Bernard Rabalais
Represented By: Blake Taylor Couvillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance Co
Represented By: Melvin A Eiden
Represented By: Steven Bernard Rabalais
Represented By: Blake Taylor Couvillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Represented By: Christie P Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?