Lemoine v. Allstate Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lemoine
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04302
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 14th Judicial District Court for Calcasieu Parish. (crt,Jones, P)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/10/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Evelyn Lemoine. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Brown, Somer)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 Binding and Irrevocable STIPULATION as to Damages by Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,King, Mary)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/16/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings L L C for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,King, Mary)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Supplemental Information by Allstate Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Counsel)(aty,King, Mary)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Co.(aty,King, Mary)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC, Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-3852-E with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4928956) filed by Allstate Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mary Ellen King added to party Allstate Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,King, Mary) Modified docket text on 12/15/2021 (Miletello, A).
December 15, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemoine v. Allstate Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lemoine
Represented By: Somer George Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Mary Ellen King
Represented By: Christopher William Kaul
Represented By: Jacob Lasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?