Webb v. A T S Operations L L C et al
Plaintiff: Kaneadra Webb
Defendant: ATS Operations, LLC, United Wisconsin Insurance Co, John Doe and A T S Operations L L C doing business as America Transport Solutions
Case Number: 2:2021cv04341
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by A T S Operations L L C, United Wisconsin Insurance Co . (aty,Young, Lindsay)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Rodger Gregory Green, Jr for Kaneadra Webb. Attorney Brian C Colomb terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/13/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rodger "Rory" G. Green, Jr. in place of Brian C. Colomb with consent by Kaneadra Webb. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/7/2022. (Attorney Rodger Gregory Green, Jr added to party Kaneadra Webb(pty:pla))(aty,Green, Rodger)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A T S Operations L L C, United Wisconsin Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent, Accident Fund Holdings Inc for United Wisconsin Insurance Co. (aty,Young, Lindsay) Modified on 1/4/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/27/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by A T S Operations L L C, United Wisconsin Insurance Co.(aty,Young, Lindsay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Lindsay Meador Young on behalf of A T S Operations L L C, United Wisconsin Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/4/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Pleadings by A T S Operations L L C, United Wisconsin Insurance Co. (aty,Young, Lindsay)
December 17, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. A T S Operations L L C answer due 12/27/2021; United Wisconsin Insurance Co answer due 12/27/2021.ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in #2 Exhibit. (crt,Crick, S)
December 17, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-4263G (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4933263) filed by United Wisconsin Insurance Co, ATS Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 Exhibit List of Attorneys)(Attorney Lindsay Meador Young added to party ATS Operations, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay Meador Young added to party United Wisconsin Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Young, Lindsay) Modified on 12/21/2021 to indicate #2 State Court Pleadings submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. A T S Operations L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaneadra Webb
Represented By: Brian C Colomb
Represented By: Rodger Gregory Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATS Operations, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Meador Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Wisconsin Insurance Co
Represented By: Lindsay Meador Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A T S Operations L L C doing business as America Transport Solutions
Represented By: Lindsay Meador Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?