Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01 et al v. Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-67622-01, HDI Global Specialty SE, Evanston Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01, H D I Global Specialty S E and Evanston Insurance Co
Defendant: Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation, Inc. and Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv04342
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc answer due 2/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/21/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc. (aty,Watson, Wells)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Wells Talbot Watson on behalf of Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/3/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Watson, Wells)
January 20, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01, Evanston Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E. Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (aty,Dodd, Virginia)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01, Evanston Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E identifying Corporate Parent HDI Global Specialty SE, Other Affiliate Hannover Ruck SE for H D I Global Specialty S E; Corporate Parent Evanston Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Syndicate 2121, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2987, Corporate Parent Syndicate 510, Corporate Parent Syndicate 33, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1301, Corporate Parent Syndicate 609, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1969, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1886, Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-67622-01, Other Affiliate Hannover Re, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Group Limited, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate QBE Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate QBE European Operations, Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Brit Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Brit UW Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Ltd., Other Affiliate StarStone Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate StarStone Insurance Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate Argenta Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hannover Ruck SE, Other Affiliate Talanx AG, Other Affiliate Haftpflichtverband der Deutschen Industrie V.a.G., Other Affiliate Apollo Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate Apollo Partners, LLP, Other Affiliate DCB Ibeson, Other Affiliate Metacomet LLC, Other Affiliate SAC White, Other Affiliate Atruim Underwriters Limited, Other Affiliate Atrium Group Limited, Other Affiliate Enstar Group Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01. (aty,Dodd, Virginia)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Virginia Y Dodd on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01, Evanston Insurance Co and H D I Global Specialty S E. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
December 17, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT "Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation with Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law" against Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4933271) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01, Evanston Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" -- Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit "B" -- Petition for Declaratory Judgment, #3 Exhibit "C" -- 11/18/21 Arbitration Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit "D" -- 12/15/21 Plaintiff's Response Letter, #5 Exhibit "E" -- Glad Tidings Memorandum Order, #6 Civil cover sheet, #7 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01(pty:pla), Evanston Insurance Co(pty:pla), H D I Global Specialty S E(pty:pla))(aty,Dodd, Virginia) (Attachment 6 & Attachment 7 replaced with unfillable pdf on 12/20/2021) (Miletello, A). Modified docket text on 12/20/2021 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01 et al v. Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-67622-01
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-67622-01
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H D I Global Specialty S E
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Co
Represented By: Virginia Y Dodd
Represented By: Heather Shawn Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Louisiana Charter Academy Foundation Inc
Represented By: Wells Talbot Watson
Represented By: Kevin Ross Sloan
Represented By: Meagan Nicole Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?