Harson et al v. Family Security Insurance Co Inc
Plaintiff: Ian Paul Harson and Lauren Matt
Defendant: Family Security Insurance Co Inc
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv00142
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Security Insurance Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for Family Security Insurance Co Inc. (aty,Doran, John)
February 21, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Family Security Insurance Co Inc.(Attorney John Ashley Doran added to party Family Security Insurance Co Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Doran, John)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian Paul Harson. Family Security Insurance Co Inc served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022 (aty,Lundy, Matthew) Modified docket text on 1/21/2022 (Miletello, A).
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED AT DOC #5 . SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian Paul Harson. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) Modified on 1/21/2022 to reflect filed in error (Miletello, A).
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Security Insurance Co Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Statutory Penalties against Family Security Insurance Co Inc (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4962810) filed by Ian Paul Harson, Lauren Matt. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew E Lundy added to party Ian Paul Harson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew E Lundy added to party Lauren Matt(pty:pla))(aty,Lundy, Matthew)
January 18, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harson et al v. Family Security Insurance Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Paul Harson
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Represented By: Gary Lee Blanchard
Represented By: Kailey K Gallegos
Represented By: Troy Houston Middleton, IV
Represented By: Kailey Kristine Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Matt
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Represented By: Gary Lee Blanchard
Represented By: Kailey K Gallegos
Represented By: Troy Houston Middleton, IV
Represented By: Kailey Kristine Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Security Insurance Co Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Arnold
Represented By: John Ashley Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?