Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy #17-7590154970-S-00 et al
Plaintiff: Charles Town Properties of Louisiana, LLC and Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy #17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co and Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv00148
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00 identifying Corporate Parent Underwriters at Lloyds London Beat Syndicate 4242, Corporate Parent Everest Corporate Member Ltd, Corporate Parent IAT CCM Ltd for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00. (aty,Cunningham, Erika)
March 4, 2022 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Q B E Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Q B E Holdings Inc, Q B E Insurance Group Ltd for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Cunningham, Erika) Modified on 3/4/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 4, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indian Harbor Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc, X L America Inc, X L Group Ltd, A X A S A, A X A X L X L Group of Companies for Indian Harbor Insurance Co. (aty,Cunningham, Erika) Modified on 3/4/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 4, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Cunningham, Erika)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co and Q B E Specialty Insurance Co answer due 3/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/14/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 11, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer,,. (aty,Siegel, Robert)
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents Crum & Forster Holdings Corp, United States Fire Insurance Co, F F H L Group Ltd, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Siegel, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/11/2022 (Miletello, A).
February 11, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00 identifying Corporate Parents G I C Re, India, Corporate Member Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00. (aty,Siegel, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/11/2022 (Miletello, A).
February 11, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00 identifying Corporate Parents Everest Corporate Member Ltd, I A T C C M Ltd for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00. (aty,Siegel, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/11/2022 (Miletello, A).
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Q B E Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents Q B E Insurance Corp, Q B E Insurance Group Ltd for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Siegel, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/11/2022 (Miletello, A).
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indian Harbor Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc, X L Group Ltd for Indian Harbor Insurance Co. (aty,Siegel, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/11/2022 (Miletello, A).
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, with consent by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Robert I Siegel added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00(pty:dft), Attorney Robert I Siegel added to party Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Robert I Siegel added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Robert I Siegel added to party Q B E Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Siegel, Robert)
February 11, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00 served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C. Indian Harbor Insurance Co served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C. Q B E Specialty Insurance Co served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C. Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C. (aty,Mize, Matthew)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A)
January 18, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy #17-7590154970-S-00, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4963705) filed by Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew Martin Mize added to party Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Mize, Matthew) Modified docket text on 1/18/2022 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy #17-7590154970-S-00 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Town Properties of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Martin Mize
Represented By: Jessie Braud Callahan
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Matthew Bond Pettaway
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Town Properties of Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Matthew Martin Mize
Represented By: Jessie Braud Callahan
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Matthew Bond Pettaway
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy #17-7590154970-S-00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No 17-7590154970-S-00
Represented By: Robert I Siegel
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert I Siegel
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert I Siegel
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert I Siegel
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?