U O P L L C v. Industria del Hierro S A de C V
Plaintiff: U O P L L C
Defendant: Industria del Hierro S A de C V
Case Number: 2:2022cv01089
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #45 Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision, . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #46 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #45 Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision. Motion day set for 7/27/2022 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #45 Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision, by U O P L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Parrott, G)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision, the decision re #8 Order on Motion for Alternative Service be VACATED and the email service on Industria be QUASHED. Consideration of the remaining motions in this case is hereby STAYED pending proper service upon and appearance by Industria. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/7/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The clerk is directed to docket the proposed pleading. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/3/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Black, Brandon)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #43 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Deficiency to Brandon K Black on behalf of Industria del Hierro S A de C V regarding #39 Reply to Response to Motion, #41 Reply to Response to Motion. Reason: Replies to response to motion are limited to 7 pages for Judge Cain, Judge Drell, Judge Joseph, and Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes. (crt,Chavis, J)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DEFICIENT ? REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(5) SEALED MOTION MOTION to Stay filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. (aty,Black, Brandon) Modified to indicate deficient status on 6/1/2022 (Chavis, J).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. (aty,Black, Brandon)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DEFICIENT REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(5) SEALED MOTION MOTION to Stay filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. (aty,Black, Brandon) Modified to indicate deficient status on 6/1/2022 (Chavis, J). Modified to remove deficient notation, see corrective document #43 on 6/3/2022 (Chavis, J).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/31/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Written Statement of Appeal and Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and Local Rule 74.1 filed by U O P L L C. (aty,Cheatham, Scott)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Compel and MOTION to Stay filed by U O P L L C. (aty,Cheatham, Scott) Modified to edit docket text and document linkage on 5/27/2022 (Chavis, J).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(5) filed by U O P L L C. (aty,Cheatham, Scott) Modified to edit docket text on 5/27/2022 (Chavis, J).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Revise Briefing Schedule for MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Black, Brandon) Modified on 5/31/2022 to modify docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION for Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance filed by U O P L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Parrott, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Scott Cheatham)(aty,Cheatham, Scott)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #27 MOTION to Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance: Responses due by 5/24/2022, Replies due by 5/26/2022. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/20/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Motion to Expedite. Abbreviated briefing deadlines will be set by ensuing order. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/20/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order REMARK: Having determined the appeal fee was paid in error regarding #26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge, a refund of the filing fee of $505.00, Receipt ALAWDC-5110846, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V regarding #28 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #27 MOTION for Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance . (aty,Black, Brandon)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 6/29/2022 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #27 MOTION for Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(aty,Black, Brandon) See Proposed Order document #30 .
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(aty,Black, Brandon) Modified to create docket entry relationship on 5/19/2022 (Chavis, J). M
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge as to #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. (Filing fee $505, receipt number ALAWDC-5110846) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support)(aty,Black, Brandon) Modified to properly capture motion event on 5/19/2022 (Chavis, J). Modified security setting for Memorandum per chambers instructions on 5/19/2022 (Benoit, T).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #28 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #27 MOTION for Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action to Brandon K Black on behalf of Industria del Hierro S A de C V regarding #26 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge. Action taken: Modified entry to more accurately identify the pleading submitted. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #27 MOTION for Revise Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding 23 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(5) SEALED MOTION MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Meagan Bachman for U O P L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/17/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Randa Adra for U O P L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/17/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF image can be found with doc 23 . (crt,Chavis, J) Modified to simplify docket text and add document number on 5/18/2022 (Chavis, J).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #17 MOTION to Seal Attached Document filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V: The same briefing deadlines contained in the previous order also apply to the Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration and Motion to Compel Arbitration contained in the proposed response to the Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/17/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #17 MOTION to Seal Attached Document filed by Industria del Hierro S A de C V: As to the Motion to Dismiss filed along with defendant's proposed response, plaintiff is ordered to file a response by 5/27/2022. Defendant will then have until 6/1/2022 to file a reply. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/17/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Motion to Seal Attached Document. The clerk is directed to docket the proposed pleading under seal. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/17/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Reply in Support of Motion to Expedite filed by U O P L L C. (aty,Cheatham, Scott)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 QUASHED - SUMMONS Returned Executed by U O P L L C. Industria del Hierro S A de C V served on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. (aty,Cheatham, Scott) Modified to reflect quashed on 6/7/2022 (Bunting, M). See #45 Memorandum Order.
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Industria del Hierro S A de C V. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney Brandon K Black added to party Industria del Hierro S A de C V(pty:dft))(aty,Black, Brandon)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT: Memorandum in Support by U O P L L C re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(crt,Chavis, J)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Seal Attached Document; granting #11 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/10/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Randa Adra to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5099095) by U O P L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Cheatham, Scott)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Meagan Bachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5099075) by U O P L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Cheatham, Scott)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance: Chambers has been informed that the defense opposes the request for expedited consideration and hearing on this motion. Accordingly, the defense is ordered to enroll and file a response to that request by 5/13/2022. Plaintiff may then file a reply by 5/16/2022. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/9/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance, #11 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attached Document MOTION to Expedite . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Reeves, T)
May 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/7/2022 as to #11 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attached Document MOTION to Expedite . (crt,Reeves, T)
May 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/7/2022 as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance. (crt,Reeves, T)
May 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attached Document , MOTION to Expedite by U O P L L C. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/7/2022.) Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Mandatory Injunction and Specific Performance, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Faiella and Exhibits A through N, #4 Proposed order)(aty,Parrott, G) Modified text on 5/9/2022 (Reeves, T).
May 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Redacted MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance and MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by U O P L L C. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/7/2022.) Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Theordore Faiella, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Parrott, G) Modified on 5/9/2022 (Reeves, T). Added MOTION to Expedite on 5/17/2022 (Reeves, T). Modified to add docket entry relationship to 12 on 5/19/2022 (Chavis, J).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U O P L L C re #7 MOTION for Alternative Service (aty,Cheatham, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VACATED - ORDER granting #7 Motion for Alternative Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/5/2022. (crt,Reeves, T) Modified to reflect vacated on 6/7/2022 (Bunting, M). See #45 Memorandum Order.
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Alternative Service by U O P L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Phan, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Scott R. Cheatham, #4 Proposed order)(aty,Parrott, G)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U O P L L C identifying Corporate Parent Honeywell International Inc, Corporate Parent Honeywell Specialty Materials LLC for U O P L L C. (aty,Cheatham, Scott)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Industria del Hierro S A de C V. (crt,Reeves, T)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEALED COMPLAINT by U O P L L C. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Sealed Exhibit C). (Filed under seal per #3 Order.)(crt,Reeves, T)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Attached Document; granting #2 Motion to Expedite. Considering the Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal and for Expedited Consideration (the Motion) filed by Plaintiff UOP LLC; IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is hereby granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following documents attached to the Motion shall be filed under seal: i. Verified Complaint (non-redacted);ii. Exhibit A to Verified Complaint;iii. Exhibit B to Verified Complaint; andiv. Exhibit C to Verified Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that access to the sealed documents should be limited to Court personnel, the parties, and counsel for the parties, unless otherwise ordered by the Court after a contradictory motion by any other person seeking access to the sealed records. Finally, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to take any and all measures necessary to ensure that these documents remain under seal unless and until ordered otherwise. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/26/2022. (crt,Higgins, M)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attached Document , Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Consideration (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2022.) by UOP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed order)(aty,Cheatham, Scott)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT REDACTED against Industria del Hierro, S.A., de C.V. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5080958) filed by UOP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Scott Robert Cheatham added to party UOP LLC (pty:pla))(aty,Cheatham, Scott) Modified to reflect pdf is redacted on 4/25/2022 (Reeves, T).
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Reeves, T)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Industria del Hierro, S.A., de C.V., requested by U O P L L C. (aty,Cheatham, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U O P L L C v. Industria del Hierro S A de C V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U O P L L C
Represented By: Scott Robert Cheatham
Represented By: G Robert Parrott, II
Represented By: Meagan Bachman
Represented By: Randa Adra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industria del Hierro S A de C V
Represented By: Richard John Tyler
Represented By: Brandon K Black
Represented By: Chad Vincent Theriot
Represented By: Winfred Thomas Barrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?