Health Enrichment Network Inc v. Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Plaintiff: Health Enrichment Network Inc
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv03816
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Wilson L Maloz, III on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/2/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 19, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 19, 2022 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of No Objection per L.R. 7.4.1 and 7.9, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Wilson L Maloz, III added to party Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd(pty:dft))(aty,Maloz, Wilson)
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Health Enrichment Network Inc. Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (aty,Jones, John)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 9/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Alexander, E)
August 24, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5236002) filed by Health Enrichment Network Inc. (Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Health Enrichment Network Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, John) Modified on 9/21/2022 to indicate civil cover sheet filed within pdf of Main Document. (Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Enrichment Network Inc v. Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Enrichment Network Inc
Represented By: John Craig Jones
Represented By: Craig Ray Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Represented By: Wilson L Maloz, III
Represented By: Matthew Francis Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?