Bouillion v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Plaintiff: Shelley Bouillion
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv05920
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Ammons, Todd)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/10/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/9/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Miletello, A)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Ammons, Todd)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, LA, Case Number 2022-4040-G (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5360491) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Todd M Ammons added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Ammons, Todd)
November 9, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouillion v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Bouillion
Represented By: Shelley Babineaux Bouillion
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Todd M Ammons
Represented By: David L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?