Gigis Downtown L L C v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Gigis Downtown L L C
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Co and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 2:2022cv05948
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Menou, Sydnee) Modified on 12/13/2022 to more accurately describe pleading submitted (Miletello, A).
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified docket text on 12/12/2022 (Miletello, A).
December 2, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John)
November 30, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John)
November 30, 2022 Filing 14 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #9 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to John Powers Wolff, III, on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/16/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co answer due 12/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/16/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Extension. The extension is granted by separate, written order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/16/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 11/15/2022 to more accurately describe pleading submitted (Miletello, A).
November 15, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #8 MOTION to Expedite. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Miletello, A)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 11/14/2022 to reflect filed in error (Miletello, A).
November 11, 2022 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR. MOTION to Expedite consideration of #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 11/14/2022 to reflect filed in error (Miletello, A).
November 11, 2022 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 11/14/2022 to reflect filed in error (Miletello, A).
November 10, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co answer due 11/17/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 10, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC, Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2022-4341; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5363673) filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Notice of Compliance, #4 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit Estimate)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) Modified filer and docket text on 11/14/2022 (Miletello, A). Modified on 11/15/2022 to indicate amended with correct party name, see #6 Amended Notice of Removal (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gigis Downtown L L C v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigis Downtown L L C
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Matthew Martin Mize
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Represented By: Tristan Gregory Gruspier
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Represented By: W Brett Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Co
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Cole Cisco Frazier
Represented By: Courtney Lehan Fournet
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Sydnee Doolittle Menou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?