Spears v. U S Dept of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Dwayne Spears
Defendant: U S Drug Enforcement Administration, USA, U S Dept of Justice and Anthony Pharao
Petitioner: MJK Trucking, LLC
Respondent: Department of Justice and DEA Agent Anthony Pharao
Case Number: 2:2022cv06103
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Dept of Justice, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, Anthony Pharao. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 28, 2022 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by Marcus Dwayne Spears. ( Filing Fee: $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5409172) . (aty,Draughter, Charlie)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Information provided in plaintiff's IFP form (doc. 1, att. 13) shows he has sufficient funds on deposit to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff allowed 30 days to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/6/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marcus Dwayne Spears. (aty,Draughter, Charlie)
December 2, 2022 Filing 4 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Marcus Dwayne Spears regarding 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (aty,Draughter, Charlie)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Complaint/Motion filed by Marcus Dwayne Spears regarding 1 Complaint,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Draughter, Charlie)
December 2, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency to Charlie Joseph Draughter, Jr on behalf of Marcus Dwayne Spears regarding 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 1 Complaint. Reason: Regarding Complaint: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form. Regarding Motion for IFP: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Dwayne Spears. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #13 of document 1 Complaint. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/30/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified to reflect deficient status on 12/1/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to add document number on 12/1/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to remove deficient status on 12/2/2022. See document 4 for PDF image. (Thomas, T).
November 30, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2:22-cv-06103 against Department of Justice, U S Drug Enforcement Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Marcus Dwayne Spears. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit State's Notice of Pending Forfeiture, #3 Exhibit DEA Notice of Seizure of Property and Initiation of Administrative Forfeiture Proceedings, #4 Exhibit Marcus Spears' State Claim, #5 Exhibit Marcus Spears' Federal Claim, #6 Exhibit Marcus Spears' Declarations in Support of Motion, #7 Exhibit Loan Contract with Vox, #8 Exhibit Loan Contract with Kalmata, #9 Exhibit Receipts of 2 Withdrawals from Movant's Wells Fargo Bank Account, #10 Exhibit Wells Fargo Bank Statements, #11 Exhibit DEA's acceptance of Claim, #12 Civil cover sheet Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed pleading Pauper Form)(Attorney Charlie Joseph Draughter, Jr added to party Marcus Dwayne Spears(pty:selreq))(aty,Draughter, Charlie) (Attachment 12 modified to nonfillable form and replaced on 12/1/2022) (Thomas, T). Modified to reflect deficient status on 12/1/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to remove deficiency on 12/2/2022. See document #3 for corrected PDF image (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. U S Dept of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Dwayne Spears
Represented By: Charlie Joseph Draughter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEA Agent Anthony Pharao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pharao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MJK Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?