Arceneaux et al v. Bo-Mac Contractors Ltd
Plaintiff: Tony Arceneaux and Milleson Arceneaux
Defendant: Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd and Bo-Mac Contractors Ltd
Case Number: 2:2023cv01341
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/31/2023. (crt,Jones, P)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Bo-Mac Contractors Ltd . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court record)(aty,McIntire, Amy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Petition #1 Notice of Removal, by Bo-Mac Contractors Ltd. (aty,Olinde, John)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Stewart, T)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. (aty,McIntire, Amy)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd identifying Other Affiliate JRR GP, Inc., Other Affiliate Bo-Mac Acquisitions, LLC, Other Affiliate CopperCom, Inc. for Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. (aty,McIntire, Amy)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd.(aty,McIntire, Amy)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/27/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
September 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John Derek Aswell, Amy Lee McIntire on behalf of Milleson Arceneaux, Tony Arceneaux, Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/11/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
September 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Amy Lee McIntire on behalf of Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/11/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
September 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Parish of Calcasieu, Case Number 2023-2801 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5706303) filed by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Amy Lee McIntire added to party Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd(pty:dft))(aty,McIntire, Amy)
September 27, 2023 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 6:23-cv-1341 from Lafayette Division to Lake Charles Division. New Case Number 2:23-cv-1341. (crt,Crick, S)
September 27, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S)
September 27, 2023 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd answer due 10/4/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arceneaux et al v. Bo-Mac Contractors Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Arceneaux
Represented By: John Derek Aswell
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milleson Arceneaux
Represented By: John Derek Aswell
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd
Represented By: Amy Lee McIntire
Represented By: John F Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo-Mac Contractors Ltd
Represented By: Amy Lee McIntire
Represented By: John F Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?