Nunez v. Calcasieu Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Nunez
Defendant: Sheriffs Office Calcasieu Parish, Calcasieu Parish Correctional Center, Riverbend Detention Center, East Carol Sheriff's Office, East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office, East Baton Rouge Correctional Center and Sheriff Office East Carroll
Case Number: 2:2024cv00334
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas P LeBlanc
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey A Nunez. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Proposed order)(crt,Haik, K)
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Sheriffs Office Calcasieu Parish, Calcasieu Parish Correctional Center, Sheriff Office East Carroll, Riverbend Detention Center filed by Jeffrey A Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/6/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 4/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights form, #2 In Forma Pauperis form)(crt,Devillier, W)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/1/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 5, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 5, 2024 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00018. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. The pending Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DEFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/5/2024. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/5/2024.]
January 10, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/5/2024.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeffrey A Nunez (NLT) . [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/5/2024.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calcasieu Parish Correctional Center, Calcasieu Parish Sheriff's Office, East Baton Rouge Correctional Center, East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office, East Carol Sheriff's Office, Riverbend Detention Center, filed by Jeffrey A Nunez.(NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/5/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Calcasieu Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office Calcasieu Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calcasieu Parish Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverbend Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Carol Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Office East Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?