United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al v. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission et al
Plaintiff: Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles and UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS
Defendant: CHARLOTTE BURROWS and Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Petitioner: National Council of Jewish Women, Legal Aid Society - Employment Law Center, American Federation of Teachers, Legal Aid at Work, Communications Workers of America, Actors Equity Association, Center for WorkLife Law, American Postal Workers Union A F L - C I O, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Americans United for Separation of Church & State, Bend the Arc A Jewish Partnership for Justice, National Womens Law Center, National Center for Law & Economic Justice, Better Balance, Interfaith Alliance, American Civil Liberties Foundation of Louisiana, National Employment Law Project, National Partnership for Women & Families, One Fair Wage, Public Counsel, Service Employees International Union and United Food & Commerical Workers International Union
Amicus Curiae: Small Business Majority, Main Street Alliance and American Sustainable Business Council
Case Number: 2:2024cv00691
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Thomas P LeBlanc
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Filing 64 Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and Charlotte Burrows . (aty,Blomberg, Daniel) Modified filers on 7/19/2024 (Bunting, M).
July 16, 2024 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #62 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct #53 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, with opposition . Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 16, 2024 Motions Transferred regarding #62 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct #53 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, with opposition . Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 15, 2024 Filing 62 MOTION to Alter Judgment, MOTION to Amend/Correct #53 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, with opposition (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2024.) by Charlotte Burrows and Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Widas, Alexandra) Modified docket text on 7/16/2024 (Bunting, M).
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint with opposition. Charlotte Burrows answer due 8/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 7/10/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
July 3, 2024 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, with opposition filed by Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. (aty,Blomberg, Daniel)
July 2, 2024 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, with opposition by All Defendants. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Widas, Alexandra)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Considering the #57 Consolidation Order issued by the District Judge, a Scheduling Conference is set for 7/25/2024 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc in this matter, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al v. EEOC, et al, (2:24-cv-00691), and in State of Louisiana et al v. EEOC (2:24-cv-00629). The parties will discuss preliminary coordination of pretrial matters; this conference will not result in the selection of a trial date. Counsel are to call the Chambers Teleconference Line at 877-336-1274, Access Code 7066014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 7/1/2024. (crt,Crawford, Andrea)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Case 2:24-cv-0629 & 2:24-cv-0691 are CONSOLIDATED for purpose of discovery and pre-trial motion practice. The matters are REFERRED to the magistrate judge for a scheduling conference. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/27/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 26, 2024 Filing 56 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Consolidation Order by Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Schwei, Daniel) Modified on 6/26/2024 (Crick, S).
June 26, 2024 Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Consolidating Related Cases by Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Blomberg, Daniel) Modified on 6/26/2024 to capture motion event. (Crick, S).
June 26, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #56 Proposed Order. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/26/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 26, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #55 Proposed Order. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/26/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 24, 2024 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Catholic University of America Charlotte Burrows served on 5/29/2024, answer due 7/29/2024; Equal Employment Opportunity Commission served on 5/29/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 54 Summons Returned Executed. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 6/25/2024 to add document number.(Crick, S).
June 24, 2024 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Daniel H Blomberg on behalf of Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops regarding 54 Summons Returned Executed,. Action taken: Terminated 54 Summons Return Executed. Docketed Summons Return Executed as to USA to capture correct answer due date. (crt,Crick, S)
June 24, 2024 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Catholic University of America. Charlotte Burrows served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024; Equal Employment Opportunity Commission served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (aty,Blomberg, Daniel)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [Doc. 17], filed by the States of Louisiana and Mississippi, and the MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [Doc. 11] filed by the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, and Catholic University of America are GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this preliminary injunction postpones the effective date of the Final Rule's requirement that covered entities provide accommodation for the elective abortions of employees that are not necessary to treat a medical condition related to pregnancy. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the EEOC is preliminarily enjoined with respect to the above-listed parties from: (i) initiating any investigation into claims that a covered employer has failed to accommodate an elective abortion that is not necessary to treat a medical condition related to pregnancy; and (ii) issuing any Notice of Right to Sue with respect to the same. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/17/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 14, 2024 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. (aty,Blomberg, Daniel)
June 14, 2024 Filing 51 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion & Order in Tennessee v EEOC)(aty,Schwei, Daniel)
June 13, 2024 Filing 50 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Sustainable Business Council, Main Street Alliance, Small Business Majority. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Laura Narefsky for National Womens Law Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lindsey Kaley for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ming-Qi Chu for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gaylynn Ann Burroughs for National Womens Law Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gillian Thomas for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kaitlyn Golden for American Sustainable Business Council, Main Street Alliance, Small Business Majority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Carrie Flaxman for American Sustainable Business Council, Main Street Alliance, Small Business Majority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/13/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
June 12, 2024 Filing 41 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge David C Joseph. MOTION HEARING held on 6/12/2024 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Catholic University of America, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles. After considering oral argument, the applicable law, and memoranda submitted, the Court took #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction under advisement. The Court invited supplemental briefing on any issues addressed in oral argument by Friday, June 14, 2024. (Court Reporter: Cathleen E Marquardt) (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 11, 2024 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. (Attachments: #1 Second Caraway Declaration, #2 Second Ridderhoff Declaration)(aty,Blomberg, Daniel)
June 11, 2024 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during a new filing. A refund of the duplicate payment of $105.00, receipt #ALAWDC-5969209, has been processed in pay.gov this date. The attorney is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,Burns, P)
June 10, 2024 Filing 39 MOTION for Laura Narefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5969218) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana, National Women's Law Center. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Perry, Charles)
June 10, 2024 Filing 38 MOTION for Lindsey Kaley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5969217) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana, National Women's Law Center. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Perry, Charles)
June 10, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION for Ming-Qi Chu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5969215) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana, National Women's Law Center. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Perry, Charles)
June 10, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION for Gaylynn Ann Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5969214) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana, National Women's Law Center. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Perry, Charles)
June 10, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION for Gillian Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number BLAWDC-5969209) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana, National Women's Law Center. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Perry, Charles)
June 10, 2024 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curae with consent by American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana, American Civil Liberties Union, National Women's Law Center. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Proposed Brief of Amici Curae, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Charles Andrew Perry added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Louisiana(pty:selreq), American Civil Liberties Union(pty:selreq), National Women's Law Center(pty:selreq))(aty,Perry, Charles) Modified on 6/11/2024 to modify docket text. Crick, S).
June 10, 2024 Filing 33 Ex Parte MOTION for Kaitlyn Golden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5968570) by American Sustainable Business Council, Main Street Alliance, Small Business Majority. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Most, William)
June 10, 2024 Filing 32 Ex Parte MOTION for Carrie Flaxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5968559) by American Sustainable Business Council, Main Street Alliance, Small Business Majority. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Most, William)
June 10, 2024 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief with consent by Small Business Majority, Main Street Alliance, American Sustainable Business Council. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed pleading, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney William Brock Most added to party Small Business Majority(pty:am), Attorney William Brock Most added to party Main Street Alliance(pty:am), Attorney William Brock Most added to party American Sustainable Business Council(pty:am))(aty,Most, William)
June 6, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on 6/5/2024 before Judge David C Joseph. Court Reporter Myra Primeaux, Telephone number (318)442-3080. Total pages: 33. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/1/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2024. (crt,Primeaux, M)
June 5, 2024 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (aty,Schwei, Daniel)
June 5, 2024 Filing 28 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge David C Joseph. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2024. #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 6/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Defendants, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission shall file their Responses by end of day 6/5/2024. Replies due by 6/11/2024. (Court Reporter: Myra Primeaux) (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 31, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Regarding June 5, 2024 Joint Hearing by Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (aty,Bakst, Laura)
May 30, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE by Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops Regarding June 5, 2024 Joint Hearing (aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 29, 2024 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Joint hearing and argument RESET for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. See Electronic Minute Entry 24 for additional details. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 5/29/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 29, 2024 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A joint hearing is set for 6/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph to hear argument and issue rulings regarding the following items: 1 - The Court's sua sponte consolidation of docket numbers 24-cv-629 and 24-cv-691 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2); 2- The Defendant's Motion to Transfer [Doc. 5] in 24-cv-629; 3 - To set a briefing schedule and hearing date for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in 24-cv-691 prior to implementation of the Final Rule on June 18, 2024. The parties may, but are not required, to file briefing pertinent to these issues on or before May 31, 2024. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 5/29/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 28, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Widas on behalf of Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attorney Alexandra Widas added to party Charlotte Burrows(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Widas added to party Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:dft)) (aty,Widas, Alexandra)
May 28, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura B Bakst on behalf of Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attorney Laura B Bakst added to party Charlotte Burrows(pty:dft), Attorney Laura B Bakst added to party Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:dft)) (aty,Bakst, Laura)
May 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jonathan Berry for Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jordan T Varberg for Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrea R Butler for Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette,Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Laura Wolk Slavis for Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Daniel H Blomberg for Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette,Daniel H Blomberg for Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of James R Conde for Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Joseph. Judge James D Cain, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 5/24/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
May 23, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE by Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Defendants' Opposition (aty,Schwei, Daniel)
May 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwei on behalf of Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attorney Daniel Schwei added to party Charlotte Burrows(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Schwei added to party Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:dft)) (aty,Schwei, Daniel)
May 23, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Charlotte Burrows. (crt,Crick, S)
May 22, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Crick, S)
May 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles . Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in support of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Caraway Declaration, #3 Exhibit Brown Declaration, #4 Exhibit Fontenot Declaration, #5 Exhibit Kunkel Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ridderhoff Declaration, #7 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for James R. Conde to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5952773) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Jonathan Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5952772) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Jordan T. Varberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5952771) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Andrea R. Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5952770) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Laura Wolk Slavis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5952769) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Daniel H. Blomberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5952767) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,O'Brien, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles of Local Rule 3.1 List of Collateral Cases (aty,O'Brien, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles. (aty,O'Brien, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles . (aty,O'Brien, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2024 to modify docket text.(Crick, S).
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charlotte Burrows, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5952733) filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic University of America, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Attorney Michael J O'Brien added to party Catholic University of America, (pty:pla), Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette (pty:pla), Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles (pty:pla), United States Conference of Catholic Bishops(pty:pla))(aty,O'Brien, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al v. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Council of Jewish Women
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Legal Aid Society - Employment Law Center
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Legal Aid at Work
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Communications Workers of America
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Actors Equity Association
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for WorkLife Law
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Postal Workers Union A F L - C I O
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Ming Qi Chu
Represented By: Lindsey Kaley
Represented By: Gillian Thomas
Represented By: Gillian Thomas
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Americans United for Separation of Church & State
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bend the Arc A Jewish Partnership for Justice
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Womens Law Center
Represented By: Laura Narefsky
Represented By: Gaylynn Ann Burroughs
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Center for Law & Economic Justice
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Better Balance
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Interfaith Alliance
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Civil Liberties Foundation of Louisiana
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Employment Law Project
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Partnership for Women & Families
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: One Fair Wage
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Counsel
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United Food & Commerical Workers International Union
Represented By: Charles Andrew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLOTTE BURROWS
Represented By: Laura B Bakst
Represented By: Alexandra Widas
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Laura B Bakst
Represented By: Alexandra Widas
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic University of America
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Jordan T Varberg
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Represented By: James R Conde
Represented By: Daniel H Blomberg
Represented By: Andrea R Butler
Represented By: Michael J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Jordan T Varberg
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Represented By: James R Conde
Represented By: Daniel H Blomberg
Represented By: Andrea R Butler
Represented By: Michael J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Jordan T Varberg
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Represented By: James R Conde
Represented By: Daniel H Blomberg
Represented By: Andrea R Butler
Represented By: Michael J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS
Represented By: Laura Wolk Slavis
Represented By: Jordan T Varberg
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Represented By: James R Conde
Represented By: Daniel H Blomberg
Represented By: Andrea R Butler
Represented By: Michael J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Small Business Majority
Represented By: Kaitlyn Golden
Represented By: Carrie Flaxman
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Main Street Alliance
Represented By: Kaitlyn Golden
Represented By: Carrie Flaxman
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Sustainable Business Council
Represented By: Kaitlyn Golden
Represented By: Carrie Flaxman
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?