Vitte v. P N K Lake Charles, L L C et al
Plaintiff: Linda Vitte
Defendant: Penn Entertainment Inc, Pro Sound & Lighting L L C, H P K Lake Charles L L C, Springthorpe Brothers Corp, Penn National Gaming Inc, P N K Lake Charles L L C also known as L'Auberge du Lac formerly known as H P K Lake Charles L L C doing business as L'Auberge Casino Resort and L
Case Number: 2:2024cv01326
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas P LeBlanc
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2024 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to Calcasieu Parish State District Court filed by Springthorpe Brothers Corp. (aty,Danon, Michael)
November 12, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Vitte. Pro Sound & Lighting L L C served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,McCall, Christopher)
November 11, 2024 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Springthorpe Brothers Corp. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed as attachment to #16 Answer. Counsel is reminded that multiple pleadings should not be combined into one document but should be filed separately. (crt,Chavis, J)
November 11, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Springthorpe Brothers Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Attorney Michael Salamon Danon added to party )(aty,Danon, Michael)
October 30, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to Calcasieu Parish State District Court filed by P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc. (aty,Fontenot, Philip)
October 24, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #13 MOTION to Remand to Calcasieu Parish State District Court. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 24, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to Calcasieu Parish State District Court by Linda Vitte. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,McCall, Christopher)
October 23, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Vitte. Springthorpe Brothers Corp served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,McCall, Christopher) Modified to correct service and ansewr deadlines as an erroneous service date was entered at the time of e-filing on 10/22/2024 (Chavis, J).
October 23, 2024 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Christopher C McCall on behalf of Linda Vitte regarding #12 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect correct service date 10/07/2024 and answer due date 10/28/2024 as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 11, 2024 Filing 11 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linda Vitte. (aty,McCall, Christopher)
October 3, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pro Sound & Lighting L L C, Springthorpe Brothers Corp. (crt,Chavis, J)
October 3, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Linda Vitte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McCall, Christopher)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 10/3/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 3, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc identifying Corporate Parent Penn Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate PNK (Lake Charles), LLC d/b/a LAuberge Casino Resort, Other Affiliate Pinnacle MLS, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. for P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc. (aty,Fontenot, Philip)
October 3, 2024 Filing 6 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc. (aty,Fontenot, Philip)
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christopher C McCall on behalf of Linda Vitte. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 1, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Philip Andre' Fontenot on behalf of P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 30, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/30/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 27, 2024 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by P N K Lake Charles L L C, Penn Entertainment Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Doc. No. 1, Attachment No. 5.(crt,Mitchell, P)
September 27, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2024-3335 "D" with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6070364) filed by Penn Entertainment, Inc., PNK (Lake Charles), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 State court petition, #3 State court return of service, #4 Exhibit A - Petition - Citation - SOP, #5 Exhibit B - Defendant State Court Answer, #6 State court notice of filing, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party PNK (Lake Charles), LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Andre' Fontenot added to party Penn Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Fontenot, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitte v. P N K Lake Charles, L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Vitte
Represented By: Christopher C McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Sound & Lighting L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H P K Lake Charles L L C
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springthorpe Brothers Corp
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Represented By: Michael Salamon Danon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn National Gaming Inc
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P N K Lake Charles L L C also known as L'Auberge du Lac formerly known as H P K Lake Charles L L C doing business as L'Auberge Casino Resort
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L
Represented By: Jami Lacour Ishee
Represented By: Philip Andre' Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?