C P v. Defendant 1
Plaintiff: C P
Defendant: Defendant 1 and Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles
Case Number: 2:2024cv01615
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas P LeBlanc
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue. Responses to the #9 Motion to Dismiss are due by 02/11/2025 and replies by 02/25/2025. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/17/2024. (crt,Higgins, M)
December 16, 2024 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Date on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with consent by C P. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolf, Brittany)
December 16, 2024 Motions Transferred regarding #12 Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Date on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with consent. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 11, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge by Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles re #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims (aty,Sudduth, James)
December 10, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims. Motion day set for 1/29/2025 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 10, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's claims by Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Transcript - Hughes, #3 Exhibit Transcript - June 7, 2021 HB 492, #4 Exhibit Transcript - May 3, 2021 HB 492)(aty,Sudduth, James)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/9/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 6, 2024 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit)(aty,Sudduth, James)
December 6, 2024 Motions Transferred regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 4, 2024 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, State Court Record by Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles. (aty,Sudduth, James)
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by C P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Merit Executed by Brittany R. Wolf-Freedman, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Merit Executed by Tanya M. Radecker, Ph.D.)(aty,Wolf, Brittany) Modified on 12/4/2024 (Thomas, T).
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 12/2/2024. (crt,Jones, P)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: For the reasons stated, IT IS ORDERED that the state court record [doc. 1, att. 4] and any other attachments to the Notice of Removal that name the plaintiff/alleged victim be SEALED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants redact that record to remove all information identifying the plaintiffs name and file it as a separate exhibit to the Notice ofRemoval [doc. 1], which will not be sealed. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff file a Third Amended Complaint, restating the allegations in full and properly identifying the defendants in this matter but redacting his own name/identifying himself only by initials or a pseudonym. All future filings and exhibits in this suit should follow the same guidelines, with a motion to seal to accompany any document that must be filed in unredacted form. The parties are to comply with this order by December 4, 2024. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/26/2024. (crt,Stewart, T) Modified document type on 12/2/2024.
November 26, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/26/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 25, 2024 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles filed by C P. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #4 of document #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Thomas, T) Modified text on 11/26/2024 (Thomas, T). Modified on 11/27/2024 to modify filer.(Crick, S).
November 25, 2024 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant 1. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #6 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 25, 2024 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant 1. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #7 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 25, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 25, 2024 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant 1 filed by C P. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #4 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified text on 11/26/2024 (Thomas, T).
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2024-2510 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6123757) filed by Defendant 1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 SEALED Received State Court record, #5 Civil cover sheet, #6 Diversity Dislcosure, #7 Corporate Disclosure)(Attorney James Edward Sudduth, III added to party Defendant 1(pty:dft))(aty,Sudduth, James) Modified on 11/26/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C P v. Defendant 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant 1
Represented By: John L Fourcade
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Diocese of Lake Charles
Represented By: John L Fourcade
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C P
Represented By: Gerald Edward Meunier
Represented By: Brittany R Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?