Smith v. Unum Life Insurance Co of America
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Co of America
Case Number: 2:2025cv00106
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas P LeBlanc
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Unum Life Insurance Co of America . (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 State court notice of filing, #3 State court citation, #4 State court return of service)(aty,Welch, Lauren)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to STATE COURT PETITION by Unum Life Insurance Co of America.(aty,Welch, Lauren) Modified docket text on 2/24/2025 (Chavis, J).
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 2/6/2025. (crt,Jones, P)
February 4, 2025 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unum Life Insurance Co of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group, Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc, Corporate Parent Vanguard Group Inc for Unum Life Insurance Co of America. (aty,Welch, Lauren)
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/30/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
January 30, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Lauren A Welch on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Co of America. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
January 30, 2025 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Chavis, J)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (aty,Welch, Lauren)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC, Case Number C-2024-5307 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6178150) filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, Citations and Service Returns, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal)(Attorney Lauren A Welch added to party Unum Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(aty,Welch, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Unum Life Insurance Co of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Timothy O'Dowd
Represented By: Samuel Ross Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Co of America
Represented By: Lauren A Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?