Parrott v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: John W Parrott
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2010cv00123
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff's Petition for Attorney Fees 12 is hereby GRANTED, and that the Commissioner is ordered to remit to plaintiff's counsel a check made payable to plaintiff John W. Parrott for attorney fees in the amount of $3,810.00 (25.4 hours at $150.00 per hour) plus expenses and costs totaling $375.02. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 4/4/11. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
January 20, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 10 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED and REMANDED pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further proceedings consistent therewith. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 1/20/11. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
December 2, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by John W Parrott, RECOMMENDING that the Commissioner's decision be REVERSED and REMANDED pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42USC405(g) for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/2/10. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrott v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W Parrott
Represented By: Alex W Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: John A Broadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?