Hanna v. East Carroll Parish et al

Plaintiff: Mark Hanna
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept East Carroll Parish, Alvin Jones, Ronnie Harris, East Carroll Detention Center, Riverbend Detention Center, DeShawn Lee, Greg Williams, Jane Loe, James Shaw, Andre Brooks, June Thompson, John Roe, Henry Turner, Jane Soe and Mark Shumate
Case Number: 3:2010cv01059
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Claiborne
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 MOTION to Amend and Supplement filed by Mark Hanna. Paragraph 111 of plaintiff's 32 page attachment to his original complaint is AMENDED as stated in paragraph A of this order. Paragraph 155 of plaintiff's 32 page attachment to his original complaint is AMENDED as stated in paragraph B of this order. Henry Reed is substituted as a defendant in place of John Roe. Plaintiff's requests to add Paragraphs 1 56, 157, 158 and to amend Paragraph 59 are DENIED. Plaintiff's request to correct typographical and citation errors is DENIED as moot. ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 46 Motion to Correct Record. ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for Henry Reed, defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Clerk manually noticed order with forms.( Pro Se Response due by 3/14/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/9/11. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 2, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 47 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 39 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Mark Hanna. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 2/2/11. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
December 14, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING having fully considered the record in this matter, including plaintiff's objections, the court agrees with and ADOPTS the 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; the court issues this ruling to address plaintiff's objections; Plaintiff conte nds that he properly asserted claims against East Carroll Detention Center and River Bend Detention Center and that the Magistrate Judge has improperly recommended dismissal of these Defendants as non-juridical entities. First, even if East Carroll D etention Center were a proper Defendant in this matter, Plaintiffs remaining excessive force claim occurred at River Bend Detention Center, and, thus, Plaintiff has no claim against East Carroll Detention Center. Second,Plaintiff relies on inapplicab le authority to assert that he can bring suit against these two detention centers. Neither East Carroll Detention Center nor River Bend Detention Center is a juridical entity.These are merely the names of correctional institutions where Plaintiff was incarcerated. Finally, the Court notes that the Magistrate Judge did not recommend dismissal of the claims against East Carroll Detention Center on this basis, but the Court finds that this detention center is also subject to dismissal as a non-juridical entity. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 12/14/10. (crt,Davis, C)
December 2, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Verify the Complaint; denying as superfluous 32 Motion to Amend and Supplement the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER Ordered that 34 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is set for contradictory hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/2/10. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna v. East Carroll Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept East Carroll Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Carroll Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverbend Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeShawn Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Loe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Soe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?