Felknor v. USA et al

Plaintiff: James Samuel Felknor
Defendant: USA, Dept of Veterans Affairs and Overton Brooks V A Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2010cv01399
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Bossier
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 10 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by James Samuel Felknor. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/29/10. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 22, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James Samuel Felknor. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/22/10. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 6, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The complaint filed by Plaintiff is dismissed.Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/6/2010. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felknor v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Samuel Felknor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overton Brooks V A Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?