Holman et al v. W-Industries of Louisiana, LLC

Plaintiff: Dennis E Holman and Yolanda Holman
Defendant: W-Industries of Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 3:2011cv01864
Filed: October 21, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U P Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/22/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 15, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nabors Drilling U S A L P. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/15/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
January 30, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Greystar Corp and 89 Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/30/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
August 19, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M M R Group Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/19/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman et al v. W-Industries of Louisiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis E Holman
Represented By: James P Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Holman
Represented By: James P Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W-Industries of Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?