Perryville Gas Storage L L C v. Dawson Farms L L C

Plaintiff: Perryville Gas Storage L L C
Defendant: Dawson Farms L L C and Land Franklin Parish
Case Number: 3:2011cv01883
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 78 MOTION for Bond Proportionate Assessment of Cost Premium filed by Perryville Gas Storage L L C and 101 Motion for Offset filed by Perryville Gas Storage L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/19/12. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 12/19/2012 to add docket entry relationship(Crawford, A).
November 13, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: Judgement shall be entered in favor of Dawson Farms and against Perryville. Re 78 MOTION for Bond Proportionate Assessment of Cost Premium filed by Perryville Gas Storage L L C: Perryville must file a supplement al memorandum and supporting evidence of the amount it claims Dawson Farms is required to pay as a proportionate assessment within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Ruling. Dawson Farms will have fourteen (14) days from the date Perryville's supplemental memorandum is filed to file an opposition memorandum and any evidence. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/13/12. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 12, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Damages filed by Perryville Gas Storage L L C. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/12/12. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 1, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion for Confirmation of Condemnation of Servitude and for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction with specific conditions. Perryville Storage will post a bond in the amount of $3.9 million; Dawson Farms withdraws its jury demand for a trial on compensation. Bench trial on compensation will be held on June 25, 2012, by the undersigned; At the bench trial, the Court will determine the amount of compensation for all damages associated with the 2012 crop year; At the co nclusion of trial, based on the damages determined, the Court will assess the costs of the bond premium proportionately; Perryville Storage will notify Dawson Farms by a telephone call to its office during regular business hours at least 48 hours pri or to entry onto Dawson Farms' property. If Perryville Storage's construction is not completed prior to 2013 crop year, Dawson Farms reserves the right to file the appropriate motion for a second bench trial on damages for the 2013 crop year. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 12/1/11. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perryville Gas Storage L L C v. Dawson Farms L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perryville Gas Storage L L C
Represented By: Marjorie A McKeithen
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawson Farms L L C
Represented By: Donald L Kneipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Franklin Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?