Meyer v. Bayles et al

Plaintiff: Rose Meyer
Defendant: Arbor Terrace of Louisiana Inc, Susan Swinea, Fred M Bayles and Joanne Caldwell Bayles
Case Number: 3:2012cv00043
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 63 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Arbor and Terrace of Louisiana filed by Rose Meyer. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/15/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 16, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joanne Caldwell Bayles. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/16/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
March 12, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Claims filed by Joanne Caldwell Bayles. IT IS ORDERED that Caldwell's Motion to Dismiss shall be converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Caldwell and Meyer shall have until April 2, 2013, to file any additional materials to supplement their previously submitted documents. (Compliance Deadline set for 4/2/2013.) Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/12/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 29, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss, denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Meyers' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 40 , construed by the Court as a R ule 56(d) motion, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Caldwell's Motion for Summary Judge 36 is DENIED without prejudice at this time, subject to her right to re-urge the motion at the close of discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bayles ' Motion for Summary Judgment 36 is DENIED without prejudice at this time as improperly filed in light of the automatic stay provision of 11 U.S.C. 362. No motions pertaining to Bayles will be considered during the pendency of the stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Scheduling Order issue, setting all deadlines for Myer's claims against Defendants other than Bayles, including discovery deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/29/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 28, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendation GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff, Rose Meyer, Dismissing, with prejudice, plaintiff's claim against Swinea. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 6/28/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 11, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Serve by U S Marshal and 7 Motion to Appoint Curator; however, plaintiff is granted 60 day extension of time from the date of this order in which to effect service on defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 05/11/12. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 26, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Rose Meyer and 11 Amended Document filed by Rose Meyer. Given plaintiff's recent amendment 11 , the undersigned finds that the court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action via diversity. 28 U.S.C. 1332. Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation 10 is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/26/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Bayles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Terrace of Louisiana Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Swinea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred M Bayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Caldwell Bayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Meyer
Represented By: Dianne L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?