Hill v. Franklin Parish Detention Center

Plaintiff: Gene Autry Hill
Defendant: Warden Franklin Parish Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2012cv00292
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Franklin
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's 53 Motion for Certificate of Appealability is DENIED because the applicant has failed to make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/1/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
November 28, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel and for Writ of Mandamus. The Court, sua sponte, extends Hill's deadline for filing objections to the Report and Recommendation until December 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/27/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 9, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 32 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 30 Order on Motion for Extension, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Serve, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, an d the Magistrate Judge's Order 30 is AFFIRMED for the reasons stated and those additional reasons stated in this memorandum order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hill's request for an evidentiary hearing is Denied. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/5/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 3, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion Request for Tape Recording, Ouachita Parish Sheriff Offense Report and for Discovery and Expansion of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/3/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Franklin Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Franklin Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Autry Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?