Transportation & Development v. Marquette Transportation Co L L C et al

Plaintiff: LA Dept of Transportation & Development
Defendant: John Doe and Marquette Transportation Co L L C
Case Number: 3:2012cv00712
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 285 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 284 Motion for Expedited Consideration and denying 283 Motion for Reconsideration of 281 Memorandum Ruling of Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/29/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 27, 2014 281 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 255 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena Issued to DOTD Secretary, Sherri LeBas filed by LA Dept of Transportation & Development. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/27/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 1, 2014 241 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 214 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/1/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
February 27, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply Inc., and 185 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Danny Koestler, re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Danny Koestler filed by LA Dept of Transportation & Development. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/27/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 21, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 66 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability filed by LA Dept of Transportation & Development. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/21/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 18, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 28 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marquette Transportation Co L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/18/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transportation & Development v. Marquette Transportation Co L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Dept of Transportation & Development
Represented By: Charles Brandon Brown
Represented By: Jason Kyle Placke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?