Angus Chemical Co v. Glendora Plantation Inc

Plaintiff: Angus Chemical Co
Defendant: Glendora Plantation Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv01656
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 145 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Angus Chemical Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/8/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 23, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 62 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 56 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Glendora Plantation Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/23/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 28, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 Motion To Certify Pursuant to Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/28/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
March 3, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Angus Chemical Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/3/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
November 20, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Angus Chemical Co, and 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glendora Plantation Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/20/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angus Chemical Co v. Glendora Plantation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angus Chemical Co
Represented By: W David Hammett
Represented By: Carey B Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendora Plantation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?