Bess v. Louisiana State Penitentary

Plaintiff: Lynn Bess, III
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentary
Case Number: 3:2012cv02039
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/26/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 3, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/3/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
November 28, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 19 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/28/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 6, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 4 Motion to Stay. Petitioner is ordered to comply with the August 2, 2012 memorandum order and su bmit his properly executed habeas corpus petition on the form provided to him within thirty (30) days of this date; he is further ordered to submit the $5.00 filing fee or properly executed application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Petitioner should also provide a detailed memorandum to establish that he is entitled to the stay he requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/6/2012. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bess v. Louisiana State Penitentary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Bess, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?