Rabun v. General Motors L L C, et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Peterson Rabun
Defendant: General Motors L L C
Case Number: 3:2012cv02482
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Morehouse
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by General Motors L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/22/13. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 24, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 23 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint with opposition filed by Kimberly Peterson Rabun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 07/24/2013. (crt,Yocum, M)
December 27, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by General Motors L L C. Defendant is granted leave to file an amended Notice of Removal within the next fourteen days which establishes diversity jurisdiction. If defendant fails to so comply, or if subject matter jurisdiction is found lacking, then the matter will be remanded to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/27/12. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabun v. General Motors L L C, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Peterson Rabun
Represented By: Charles E Herring, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors L L C
Represented By: Margaret Anne Cassisa
Represented By: Carl J Giffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?