Walker v. Jackson Parish et al

Plaintiff: Jerome M Walker
Defendant: District Attorney Office Jackson Parish, Gary Nunn, Sharita Baber, District Attorney Office Ouachita Parish, Police Dept City of West Monroe, Colby G Spillers, South Second Bail Bonds, A Jack Howell Bail Bonds and Andrew Leonard Roberts
Case Number: 3:2012cv02978
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Colby G Spillers. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/3/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 2, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: re 71 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim alleged in plaintiff amended complaint. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 02/02/2015. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to amend the wording in accordance with the ruling on 2/3/2015 (Bunting, M).
July 19, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 39 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Gary Nunn. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/19/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Sharita Babers, Jonathan M Stewart, 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by District Attorney Office Ouachita Parish, 10 MOTION to Dismi ss For Failure to State a Claim filed by South Second Bail Bonds, A Jack Howell Bail Bonds, Andrew Leonard Roberts, 5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Colby G Spillers, Police Dept City of West Monroe. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/3/13. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Jackson Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome M Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Office Jackson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharita Baber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Office Ouachita Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept City of West Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby G Spillers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Second Bail Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Jack Howell Bail Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Leonard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?