McFarlin v. New Hampshire Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Rickey McFarlin
Defendant: Lee Allen Wyffels, Dealers Choice Truckaway System Inc and National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Case Number: 3:2012cv03033
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 116 MOTION to Sever Gemini Insurance Company and 117 MOTION to Drop parties pursuant to Rule 21 filed by Dethmers Manufacturing Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/11/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
August 9, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 112 MOTION in Limine filed by Rickey McFarlin, and 113 JOINT MOTION in Limine filed by Gemini Insurance Co, Dethmers Manufacturing Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/9/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 30, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dethmers Manufacturing Co, and 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gemini Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/30/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 15, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rickey McFarlin. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/15/15. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarlin v. New Hampshire Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey McFarlin
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Andrew C Jacobs
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Gerald Adam Savoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Allen Wyffels
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Represented By: Christopher Keith Kinnison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealers Choice Truckaway System Inc
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Represented By: Christopher Keith Kinnison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Represented By: Christopher Keith Kinnison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?