Rice et al v. Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C

Plaintiff: Tommie Rice and Phyllis Rice
Defendant: Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C
Case Number: 3:2013cv00362
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 126 Memorandum Ruling filed by Tommie Rice, Phyllis Rice. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/1/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
February 10, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tommie Rice, and 97 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Causation filed by Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/10/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
February 4, 2016 124 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Independent Contractor Status of Physicians filed by Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/4/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
December 16, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 118 Report and Recommendation, denying 92 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/16/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
August 25, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 73 Motion to Prohibit Plaintiff from Identifying or Calling Expert Witnesses. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff is prohibited from eliciting testimony from Drs. Donald, Mormino, Stemm, and Mercer on issues beyond those present ly covered in their depositions without first disclosing the nature and substance of the topic(s) to defendant within the next 7 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cornerstones expert report deadline is extended until September 15, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cornerstones motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/25/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 17, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as redundant 71 Motion to Have the Matters Subject of Cornerstone's Requests for Admission (Propounded on Minors CIR and GMR) Be Deemed Admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/17/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 26, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 43 MOTION to Alter Judgment Ruling (Doc. No. 40 ) & Order (Doc. No. 41 ) Denying Cornerstone's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 31) filed by Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C AND 44 MOTION to Alter Judgment Order (Doc. No. 42 ) Appointing Tommie Rice as Next Friend filed by Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/26/13. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 15, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/15/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 11, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Report and Recommendations. Granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss. To the extent that Cornerstone moves for dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(b((6), the motion is GRANTED. Tommie Rice and Phyllis Rice are here by DISMISSED from this case. To the extent Cornerstone moves for dismissal pursuant to Rule (b)(7) for failure to join a party, the motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve, via certified mail, a copy of the petition, t he instant Report and Recommendation 22 , and the resulting order upon Candice Rousso, at 575 Pine Snag Road, Heber Springs, AR 72543. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Candice Rousso appear and join in this matter as Plaintiff (via existing counsel or co unsel of her own choosing), on behalf of the minors, CIR and GMR, no later than August 5, 2013. If within the same period, Candice Rousso declines to join in this matter, then she may show cause, in writing, why the Court should not appoint Tommie Rice, or some other qualified person, as next friend to prosecute this matter on behalf of the minors.. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/11/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice et al v. Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Rice
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Rice
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Hospital of West Monroe L L C
Represented By: Paul G Preston
Represented By: Linda M Uzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?