Greenup v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Levi Greenup
Defendant: Chad Lee, Jerry Goodwin, Gerald McMurry, Gimelot, White, Franklin Parish Detention Center, David Wade Correctional Center and Dept of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2013cv00392
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Claiborne
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 120 Report and Recommendations; denying 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 07/14/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)
February 20, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation 108 of the Magistrate Judge, to the extent adopted by the Court, and for those additional reasons set forth in this Courts Ruling 112 , IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that De fendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 96] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. To the extent that Defendants move for dismissal of the claims against Defendant Captain Gerald McMurray (McMurray) and for dismissal of Plaintiff Levi Greenups (Greenup) request for injunctive relief, the motion is GRANTED. All claims against McMurray are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Greenups request for injunctive relief is also DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as MOOT. The motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/20/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 5, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 61 Supplemental Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Court ADOPTS the Supplement Report and Recommendation and FINDS that Plaintiff has exhausted his administrative remedies against Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/5/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
February 5, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 44 Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Chad Lee's, Gerald McMurry's, William Guimbellot's, and Arlandus White's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jerry Goodwin's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against Jerry Goodwin are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 2/5/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenup v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Greenup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McMurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gimelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wade Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?