Smith et al v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C

Plaintiff: Linda Faye Smith and Larry Smith
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 3:2013cv02368
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING stating reasons for denying 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Larry Smith, Linda Faye Smith. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/03/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 13 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Larry Smith, Linda Faye Smith. Plaintiff's appeal is DENIED, and the Magistrate Judge's Ruling 12 is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/29/13. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 5, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 5 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/5/13. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 9/5/2013 to edit document type (Reeves, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Faye Smith
Represented By: Allan Lee Placke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Allan Lee Placke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Scott R Wolf
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?