Stewart et al v. Ruston Louisiana Hospital Co L L C et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Stewart and Sarah Stewart
Defendant: Ruston Louisiana Hospital Co L L C, Community Health Systems Inc, Women & Children Hospital of Delaware L L C, National Healthcare of Leesville Inc, Community Health Systems Professional Services Corp and Professional Account Services Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv00083
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ruston Louisiana Hospital Co L L C. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/27/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 19, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 46 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 42 Order on Motion to Remand filed by Bruce Stewart, Sarah Stewart. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/18/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 9, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 46 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 42 Order on Motion to Remand filed by Bruce Stewart and Sarah Stewart. IT IS ORDERED that the Court DEFERS its decision on Plaintiffs' 46 Appeal, and th at the parties have sixty days to conduct limited discovery on whether the Court has jurisdiction, particularly in regard to the local controversy exception's greater than two-thirds citizenship requirement. Also within the same period, the parties are granted leave of court to supplement their respective positions with memoranda and evidence, limited to the remaining issue(s) specified. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/9/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 2, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 45 Report and Recommendation re 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by Defendant Community Health systems, Inc is GRANTED, and that Plaintiffs' claims against said defendant are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/1/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
March 25, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMOANDUM ORDER denying 10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/25/14. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Ruston Louisiana Hospital Co L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruston Louisiana Hospital Co L L C
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Represented By: David Robert Kelly
Represented By: Thomas Richard Temple, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Women & Children Hospital of Delaware L L C
Represented By: Justin J Boron
Represented By: Elizabeth Anderson Roussel
Represented By: William David Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Healthcare of Leesville Inc
Represented By: Justin J Boron
Represented By: Elizabeth Anderson Roussel
Represented By: William David Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Professional Services Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Account Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Stewart
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: Derrick Glenn Earles
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stewart
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Claude Pierson Devall
Represented By: Derrick Glenn Earles
Represented By: John Lee Hoffoss, Jr
Represented By: Donald W McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?