Broussard v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery A Broussard
Defendant: Ike Brown, Samuel Lacy, Holmes, Bill Harrison and Smith
Case Number: 3:2014cv00720
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2017 206 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 173 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 156 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ike Brown, Billy Harrison, Sgt. Holmes, and Samuel Lacy is GRANTED, and the claims against these Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the claims against remaining Defendants Sgt. Smith and Henry Bates are also DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/5/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 16, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 85 Motion to Compel and 101 Motion to Compel, solely to the extent specified in the body of the decision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions, including any request for fees, expenses, and/or costs, otherwise is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/16/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 22, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Issuance of a Subpoena Compelling the 4th Judicial District Court to Relinquish Documents. The Clerk of Court for the USDC-WDLA shall complete, sign, and issue to the U.S. Marshal for service, a subpoena duces tecum (AO 88B Form) directed to Carol R. Jones, Clerk, Fourth District Court, Parish of Morehouse, 100 East Madison Ave, Bastrop, LA 71220, for production of copies of the specified documents. The 4th JDC Clerk shall provide responsive documents/information on, or before January 19, 2016. Upon receipt, the Clerk for this court shall file the documents in the instant record UNDER SEAL, and provide copies to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/22/2015. (crt,Haik, K)
July 1, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 27 Motion FOR Appointment of Counsel and for Issuance of Subpoena. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/1/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
June 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: For the reasons set forth in the Courts Ruling and for those reasons set forth in the Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 13] of the Magistrate Judge, to the extent adopted, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to amend complaint [Doc. No 2 0] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiffs Complaint, as amended, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A.The Clerk of Court is instructed to send a copy of this Order/Judgment to the keeper of theThree Strikes List in Tyler, Texas. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/17/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 30, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 7 Motion for Court Assistance in Obtaining Information; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 04/30/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery A Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?