Wade v. Home Depot U S A Inc

Plaintiff: Charmine Wade
Defendant: Home Depot U S A Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv02388
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 27 MOTION in Limine filed by Home Depot U S A Inc.. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/19/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum Ruling, 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Home Depot U S A Inc. and 38 MOTION to Expedite consideration of 37 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/7/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
January 5, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Home Depot U S A Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/5/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendations 11 ; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/10/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Home Depot U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmine Wade
Represented By: Louis Granderson Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?