Luv N Care Ltd v. Groupo Rimar

Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Defendant: Groupo Rimar
Case Number: 3:2014cv02491
Filed: August 14, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Expenses filed by Groupo Rimar, aka Suavinex. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/28/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
December 8, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Certify or Clarify Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/8/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 30, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Groupo Rimar. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/30/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 15, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting to the extent specified 32 Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDER denying 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/15/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 9, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge [Doc. No. 11] having been considered, no objections thereto having been filed, and finding that same is supported by the law and the record in this matter, IT IS ORDERED that the moti on to dismiss for insufficient service of process, Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(5) [Doc. No. 5], filed by defendant Groupo Rimar, AKA Suavinex, SA is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs prior service attempt, reflected in [Doc. No. 4] is QUASHED. Plaintiff shall proceed to serve defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/9/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luv N Care Ltd v. Groupo Rimar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Represented By: Joseph D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupo Rimar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?