Byrd v. Board of Supervisors of University of Louisiana System

Plaintiff: Misty Byrd
Defendant: University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 3:2014cv02804
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 56 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/10/17. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 18, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 43 MOTION in Limine filed by University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/18/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 22, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 29 LOUISIANA TECH'S MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors, and 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issues of Liability and Causation filed by Misty Byrd. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/22/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 13, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT denying 7 Motion to Abstain. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/13/15. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Board of Supervisors of University of Louisiana System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Byrd
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Represented By: J Michael Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?