Jones v. Steel Fabricators of Monroe L L C

Plaintiff: Lavon Jones, Jr
Defendant: Steel Fabricators of Monroe L L C
Case Number: 3:2014cv03175
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 40 Motion to Dismiss filed by Steel Fabricators of Monroe, L L C. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/12/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 14, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting Report and Recommendations re 22 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lavon Jones, Jr construed as a Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss; denying 37 Response to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Steel Fabricators of Monroe L L C construed as a Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; and GRANTING 37 Response to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Steel Fabricators of Monroe L L C construed as a Motion to Order Plaintiff to Appear at Deposition. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/14/2015.(crt,Yocum, M)
September 25, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff SHALL appear for his deposition at a time and place set forth by Defendants. ORDER denying 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and request for attorney's fees. ORDER denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subopena duces tecum. Disclosure of Plaintiff's employment records shall be conducted pursuant to the terms listed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/25/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 17, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Affirming 10 Memorandum Order and denying 32 Notice of Appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 32 Motion to Stay is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/17/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 31, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration of 10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 24 Motion to Stay as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/31/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 18, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Lavon Jones, Jr. However, in light of Plaintiff's pro se status, this matter is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Hayes to address the discovery dispute raised in his motion. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/18/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Steel Fabricators of Monroe L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavon Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Fabricators of Monroe L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?