Cheshire v. Air Methods Corp

Plaintiff: Carl C Cheshire
Defendant: Air Methods Corp
Case Number: 3:2015cv00933
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2016 202 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 189 MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Plaintiff and MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Air Methods Corp. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/1/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 25, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl C Cheshire, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air Methods Corp, and 136 MOTION to Strike 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment , specifically Plaintiff's affidavit [130-17] filed in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Air Methods Corp. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/25/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
November 30, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part 68 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to supplement her responses to Defendant's requested discovery within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/30/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 11, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant either withdraw its motion to dismiss or file a superseding motion restating its arguments in light of Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/11/15. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheshire v. Air Methods Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl C Cheshire
Represented By: Ashley Lynette Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Methods Corp
Represented By: Christine Sciacchetano Keenan
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?