White v. Cigna Group Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Esther Hill White
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance, Cigna Intellectual Property Inc and Life Insurance Co of North America
Case Number: 3:2015cv02181
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 44 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Petition for benefits, filed by Esther Hill White isDENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/26/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 26, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge re 1 Complaint and 20 Amended Complaint filed by Esther Hill White. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/26/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 17, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 32 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision and affirming 31 Memorandum Ruling. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/17/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Cigna Group Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Hill White
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Intellectual Property Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Co of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?