Kie et al v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Alvin Kie and Pecola Kie
Defendant: Tory Williams, Tommie Morgan and Werner Enterprises Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv02304
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Richland
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 137 MOTION to Alter or Amend the Judgment filed by Alvin Kie, Pecola Kie and 138 MOTION for New Trial filed by Alvin Kie, Pecola Kie. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/29/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 23, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum; denying 63 Second Motion in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum; s triking 66 Motion in Limine Concerning the 6/7/16 and 6/20/16 Reports and Corresponding Testimony of Dr. John Ledbetter; denying 68 Motion to Strike Defendants' Untimely Supplemental Exhibit and Addendum to Expert Report; granting 71 Motion to Strike 66 Motion in Limine Concerning the 6/7/16 and 6/20/16 Reports and Corresponding Testimony of Dr. John Ledbetter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/23/16. (crt,Keller, J)
September 8, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to 100% Fault of the Defendants, Course and Scope of Employment, and Insurance Coverage, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alvin Kie, Pecola Kie. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/8/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kie et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Kie
Represented By: Eddie M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pecola Kie
Represented By: Eddie M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tory Williams
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie Morgan
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?