Luv N Care Ltd v. Laurain et al

Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Defendant: Lindsey Laurain and Eazy-P Z L L C
Case Number: 3:2016cv00777
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2018 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 62 Memorandum Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/23/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 6, 2018 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 97 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/6/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 29, 2018 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 85 Motion Motion to Enforce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/29/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luv N Care Ltd v. Laurain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luv N Care Ltd
Represented By: Robert M Chiaviello, Jr
Represented By: Joseph D Guerriero
Represented By: Hartwell P Morse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Laurain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eazy-P Z L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?